SJR11
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Spearman, Jones, Parks, Diaz, Elliot Anderson, Ohrenschall, Pierce, Aizley, Hogan, Munford, Swank

Urges Congress to propose an amendment to the United States Constitution to restore the authority of the governments of the United States and individual states to regulate and restrict independent political expenditures. (BDR R-1047)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 10, Nays: 11.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 28, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 02, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 15, 2013   Yea 10,   Nay 11,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 118   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 19, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 118.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2013

Apr 12, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2013