SB321
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Jones, Denis, Smith, Segerblom, Ford, Brower, Hammond, Hutchison, Kihuen, Healey, Kirkpatrick, Frierson

Enacts a “Homeowner's Bill of Rights.” (BDR 9-748)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 403.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 10, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 11, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 12, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 02, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 16, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 24, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 405   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 547     Amend. No. 684     Amend. No. 822   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 19, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 547.) To printer.

Apr 22, 2013

Apr 23, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 21, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 684.) To printer.

May 22, 2013

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2013

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 822.) To printer.

May 24, 2013

May 27, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 684 and 822 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 403.
  • Sections 2 to 16, inclusive, of this act apply only with respect to trust agreements for which a notice of default is recorded on or after October 1, 2013, and to a judicial foreclosure action commenced on or after October 1, 2013. The amendatory provisions of section 17 of this act apply only with respect to trust agreements for which a notice of default is recorded on or after October 1, 2013. The amendatory provisions of section 18 of this act apply only to an action commenced on or after October 1, 2013.