AB309
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Flores, Bobzien, Diaz

Requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to contract for the establishment of an electronic lien system. (BDR 43-947)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 474.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 09, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 11, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 08, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Transportation     May 27, 2013     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     May 29, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 16, 2013   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 01, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 502   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 19, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 01, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 502.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

May 09, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 14, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2013

May 17, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 31, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 01, 2013

Jun 02, 2013

  • In Assembly.

Jun 05, 2013

  • To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 11, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 474.
  • Effective June 11, 2013.