AB461
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Ways and Means

Enacts provisions governing the management of sagebrush ecosystems. (BDR 26-1194)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 513.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 25, 2013     11:31 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 15, 2013     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 06, 2013     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 20, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 21, 2013     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Rescind previous action on: 5-20-13   Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 23, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     Jun 01, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Jun 01, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Jun 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 28, 2013   Yea 39,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 795   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 894   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 27, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 01, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 05, 2013

  • Amended notice of eligibility: Exempt.

May 25, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 27, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 894.) To printer.

May 28, 2013

May 29, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 03, 2013

Jun 07, 2013

  • To enrollment.

Jun 10, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 11, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 513.
  • Effective June 11, 2013.