AB67
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 20, 2012.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions relating to crimes. (BDR 3-403)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 426.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 05, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 20, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes      
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 20, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 26, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 27, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Assembly Ways and Means     Feb 28, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 07, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 14, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 28, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 29, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 01, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 09, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 11, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 13, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 14, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 16, 2013     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 22, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Judiciary     May 24, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Judiciary     May 28, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 29, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 01, 2013     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 22, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 31, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 205     Amend. No. 793     Amend. No. 912   

Bill History

Dec 20, 2012

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 27, 2012

  • From printer.

Feb 04, 2013

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 06, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 205.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.

May 17, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 21, 2013

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 793.) To printer.

May 22, 2013

May 23, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 30, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 912.) To printer.

May 31, 2013

Jun 01, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 912 concurred in.

Jun 02, 2013

  • To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 06, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 426.
  • Effective July 1, 2013.