SB127
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks

Prohibits employers from conditioning employment on a consumer credit report or other credit information. (BDR 53-453)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 76.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Feb 22, 2013     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 12, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 10, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 15, 2013     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 15, 2013     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2013   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 484   

Bill History

Feb 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 19, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 484.) To printer.

Apr 22, 2013

Apr 23, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 16, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 17, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2013

May 20, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • To enrollment.

May 23, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

May 24, 2013

  • Chapter 76.
  • Effective October 1, 2013.