SB131
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske, Kirkpatrick

Establishes provisions governing the disposition of a decedent's accounts on electronic mail, social networking, messaging and other web-based services. (BDR 12-563)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 325.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 11, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 05, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 13, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 17, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 24, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 188     Amend. No. 728     Amend. No. 840   

Bill History

Feb 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 19, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 17, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 188.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2013

Apr 22, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 22, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 728.) To printer.

May 23, 2013

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 840.) To printer.

May 24, 2013

May 27, 2013

  • In Senate.

May 29, 2013

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 728 and 840 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 31, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 325.
  • Effective October 1, 2013.