SB136
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks

Revises provisions relating to justifiable homicide by a public officer. (BDR 15-867)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 78.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 04, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 07, 2013     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     May 15, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 16, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 12, 2013   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 18, 2013   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 19, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 08, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 11, 2013

  • Read second time.

Mar 12, 2013

Mar 13, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 16, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 17, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2013

May 20, 2013

  • In Senate.
  • To enrollment.

May 23, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

May 24, 2013

  • Chapter 78.
  • Effective October 1, 2013.