SB504
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 25, 2013.
By: Education

Enacts provisions providing English Language Learning for Our Students. (BDR 34-1099)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 515.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 10, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and re-refer
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 22, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     Apr 25, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 17, 2013     07:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 30, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 01, 2013     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     Jun 01, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 02, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     Jun 02, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 03, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2013   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 526     Amend. No. 972   

Bill History

Mar 25, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 27, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2013

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.

Apr 19, 2013

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 526.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 22, 2013

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Exemption effective.
  • To committee.

Jun 03, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 972.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Jun 06, 2013

  • In Senate.

Jun 11, 2013

  • To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 12, 2013

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 515.
  • Sections16.4 and 17 of this act become effective June 12, 2013. Sections 1 to 4, inclusive, 5 to 16.3, inclusive, 16.5 and 16.6 of this act become effective on July 1, 2013. Section 4.5 of this act becomes effective on July 1, 2019. Sections 1.4, 1.5, 1.6 and 16.1 of this act expire by limitation on June 30, 2019.