SJR13
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2013.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom, Spearman, Parks, Atkinson, Ford, Denis, Kihuen, Manendo, Woodhouse, Elliot Anderson, Ohrenschall, Martin, Healey, Aizley, Hogan, Swank

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to require the recognition of all marriages, regardless of gender. (BDR C-88)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 43.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 26, 2013     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 11, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 09, 2013     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 16, 2013     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     May 17, 2013     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2013   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2013   Yea 27,   Nay 14,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 540   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2013

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 20, 2013

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2013

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 540.) To printer.

Apr 22, 2013

Apr 23, 2013

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 17, 2013

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2013

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2013

May 24, 2013

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 28, 2013

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 43.
  • (Return to 2015 Session)