AB27 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 20, 2014.
By: Education

Makes various changes regarding the licensure of educational personnel. (BDR 34-315)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 54.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Feb 09, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Education     Feb 18, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     Apr 14, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 30, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Education     May 18, 2015     01:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After passage discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 01, 2015   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 05, 2015   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 27   

Bill History

Dec 20, 2014

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Dec 22, 2014

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2015

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 26, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Mar 30, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 27.) To printer.

Mar 31, 2015

Apr 01, 2015

Apr 02, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 01, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 04, 2015

  • Read second time.

May 05, 2015

May 06, 2015

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 08, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 13, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 54.
  • Effective May 13, 2015.