SB504 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2015.
By: Finance

Amends provisions relating to a safe and respectful learning environment in public schools. (BDR 34-1201)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 115.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Mar 27, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Education     Mar 31, 2015     05:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Education     Mar 31, 2015     05:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes      Heard in joint hearing, no jurisdiction
  Senate Education     Apr 07, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 10, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     Apr 17, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 23, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Finance     Apr 30, 2015     05:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 04, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 05, 2015     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 12, 2015     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Education     May 14, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 16, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Finance     May 19, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Education     May 25, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 25, 2015     02:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     May 26, 2015     03:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 04, 2015   Yea 18,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 13, 2015   Yea 36,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 353   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 25, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 353.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 16, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 01, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 04, 2015

May 05, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 13, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.) To Senate.

May 14, 2015

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 18, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 20, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 115.
  • Effective July 1, 2015.