AB2 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 19, 2014.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hambrick

Authorizes possession of a weapon in a vehicle that is on the property of certain educational entities or child care facilities in certain circumstances. (BDR 15-75)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 04, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 18, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 19, 2014

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 22, 2014

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2015

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 11, 2015

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)