SB79 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 20, 2014.
By: Revenue and Economic Development

Revises provisions governing the taxation of alternative nicotine products and vapor products. (BDR 32-307)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 435.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Feb 05, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Taxation     Feb 10, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Feb 12, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     May 22, 2015     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Taxation     May 31, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard   Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 31, 2015   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 01, 2015   Yea 28,   Nay 11,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 954   

Bill History

Dec 20, 2014

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Dec 22, 2014

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2015

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 10, 2015

  • Waiver granted effective: April 10, 2015

May 31, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 954.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

Jun 01, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 11, Excused: 3.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 435.
  • Effective July 1, 2015.