SB111 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 01, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ford, Atkinson

Requires the use of portable event recording devices by certain peace officers employed by the Nevada Highway Patrol Division of the Department of Public Safety. (BDR 43-618)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 533.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 11, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 31, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 03, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation, recommended to be re-referred
  Senate Finance     Apr 07, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and re-refer
  Senate Government Affairs     May 08, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Government Affairs     May 13, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 27, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 29, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 01, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 31, 2015   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 01, 2015   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 357     Amend. No. 1027   

Bill History

Feb 01, 2015

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 02, 2015

  • From printer.
  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 06, 2015

  • From committee: Without recommendation and re-refer to the Committee on Finance.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Apr 08, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.

Apr 09, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 357.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 10, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 31, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1027.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.

Jun 01, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 11, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 533.
  • Sections 6.5 and 7 effective June 11, 2015. Sections 1 to 6, inclusive, effective June 11, 2015, for the purpose of adopting policies and procedures governing the use of portable event recording devices and January 1, 2017, for all other purposes. Section 6.3 effective July 1, 2015.