AB165 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2015.
By: Education

Establishes the Nevada Educational Choice Scholarship Program. (BDR 34-747)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 22.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Feb 13, 2015     11:41 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Education     Feb 18, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Education     Mar 09, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 02, 2015     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Apr 02, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May 14, 2015     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Education     May 28, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          After passage discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 01, 2015   Yea 25,   Nay 17,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 07, 2015   Yea 11,   Nay 9,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 90   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 16, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 19, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Mar 26, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Mar 30, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 90.) To printer.

Mar 31, 2015

Apr 01, 2015

Apr 02, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee.

Apr 03, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 06, 2015

  • Read second time.

Apr 07, 2015

Apr 08, 2015

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Apr 10, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Apr 13, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 22.
  • Effective April 13, 2015.