SB25 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 20, 2014.
By: Education

Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-316)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 371.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Feb 10, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Feb 26, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Mar 03, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     Apr 22, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Education     Apr 29, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 07, 2015   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 21, 2015   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 58     Amend. No. 654   

Bill History

Dec 20, 2014

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Dec 22, 2014

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2015

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 02, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 03, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 58.) To printer.

Apr 06, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 07, 2015

Apr 08, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 19, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 20, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 654.) To printer.

May 21, 2015

May 22, 2015

  • In Senate.

May 26, 2015

  • Assembly Amendment No. 654 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 05, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 371.
  • Effective July 1, 2015.