AB253 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 11, 2015.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Revises provisions governing the administration of elections. (BDR 24-1125)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 10, 2015     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 17, 2015     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 02, 2015     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, without recommendation, and rerefer

Final Passage Votes

Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 397   

Bill History

Mar 11, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 12, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 397.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Exemption effective.
  • To printer.

Apr 21, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

Jun 02, 2015

  • (No further action taken.)