SB305 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom

Authorizes industrial hemp farming in this State under certain circumstances. (BDR 49-656)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 349.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar 31, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 07, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 05, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Rescheduled
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 12, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 14, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 20, 2015   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 22, 2015   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 342     Amend. No. 787   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 18, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 342.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2015

Apr 21, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.

May 21, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 787.) To printer.

May 22, 2015

May 25, 2015

  • In Senate.

May 27, 2015

  • Assembly Amendment No. 787 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 349.
  • Effective June 4, 2015 for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2016, for all other purposes.