SB391 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 17, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Harris, Kieckhefer, Farley, Roberson, Woodhouse, Atkinson, Denis, Ford, Goicoechea, Gustavson, Kihuen, Lipparelli, Manendo, Parks, Settelmeyer, Spearman, Elliot Anderson

Revises provisions governing educational instruction in the subject of reading. (BDR 34-644)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 334.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 07, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 09, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr 30, 2015     05:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 04, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 05, 2015     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     May 07, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Finance     May 12, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Finance     May 16, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Education     May 18, 2015     01:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Education     May 19, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 29, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 30, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2015     04:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned
  Senate Finance     Jun 01, 2015     12:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 14, 2015   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 28, 2015   Yea 38,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 511     Amend. No. 705     Amend. No. 895   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 19, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 511.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 16, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 12, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 13, 2015

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 705.) To printer.

May 14, 2015

May 18, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 22, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 26, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 895.) To printer.

May 27, 2015

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2015

May 29, 2015

  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 30, 2015

  • Assembly Amendment No. 895 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 334.
  • Effective June 3, 2015, for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and for all other purposes. Sections 4 to 9, inclusive, 15 and 16.1 effective July 1, 2015. Sections 1, 2, 3 and 10 to 14, inclusive, effective July 1, 2019.