AB121 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 06, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wheeler, Ellison, Jones, Dickman, Moore, O'Neill, Oscarson

Revises provisions governing the discipline of pupils. (BDR 34-173)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 363.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Feb 23, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Education     Mar 04, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Education     Mar 11, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Education     Mar 16, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     May 12, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     May 14, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Education     May 14, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 15, 2015   Yea 24,   Nay 17,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 22, 2015   Yea 15,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 135   

Bill History

Feb 06, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 09, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 08, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 135.) To printer.

Apr 09, 2015

Apr 10, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2015

Apr 16, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 15, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2015

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2015

May 26, 2015

  • In Assembly.

May 27, 2015

  • To enrollment.

May 29, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 05, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 363.
  • Effective June 5, 2015.