AB159 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2015.
By: Government Affairs

Makes various changes to provisions governing public works. (BDR 28-936)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 455.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 11, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard   Rescheduled
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 12, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 07, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Government Affairs     May 06, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 13, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 15, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 20, 2015   Yea 25,   Nay 17,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 21, 2015   Yea 12,   Nay 8,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 835   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 16, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 10, 2015

  • Read second time.

Apr 14, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2015

Apr 21, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 20, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 835.) To printer.

May 21, 2015

May 22, 2015

  • In Assembly.

Jun 01, 2015

  • Senate Amendment No. 835 concurred in.

Jun 02, 2015

  • To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 455.
  • Effective July 1, 2015.