AB167 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 17, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Fiore, Shelton, Seaman, Ellison, Hansen, Armstrong, Dickman, Dooling, Gardner, Hambrick, Jones, Kirner, Moore, O'Neill, Oscarson, Silberkraus, Stewart, Titus, Trowbridge, Wheeler, Woodbury, Gustavson, Atkinson, Goicoechea

Authorizes the storage and carrying of firearms and ammunition on the premises of a family foster home or by certain persons who reside in a family foster home under certain circumstances. (BDR 38-234)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 527.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 04, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 18, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 27, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 06, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 13, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Reschedule
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 14, 2015     12:00 PM          Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 23, 2015   Yea 26,   Nay 15,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 29, 2015   Yea 16,   Nay 3,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 786     Amend. No. 1008   

Bill History

Feb 17, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 18, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 19, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 20, 2015

  • Read second time.

Mar 23, 2015

Mar 24, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 19, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 786.)
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Secretary's desk.

May 22, 2015

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
  • Waiver granted effective: May 22, 2015.

May 29, 2015

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1008.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 3, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.

May 30, 2015

  • In Assembly.

May 31, 2015

  • Senate Amendment Nos. 786 and 1008 concurred in.

Jun 02, 2015

  • To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 527.
  • Effective June 10, 2015.