AB414 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 19, 2015.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions governing agreements with certain governments for purposes of interactive gaming. (BDR 41-1072)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 19, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 07, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 10, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 17, 2015   Yea 23,   Nay 17,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 19, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 20, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 15, 2015

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2015

  • Read second time.

Apr 17, 2015

Apr 20, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 16, 2015

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)