SB175 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 18, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Roberson, Lipparelli, Hammond, Brower, Settelmeyer, Farley, Goicoechea, Gustavson, Hardy, Harris, Kieckhefer, Hambrick, Wheeler, Shelton

Makes various changes relating to public safety. (BDR 15-515)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 328.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 25, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 03, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 13, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 23, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 13, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Judiciary     May 15, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 26, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     May 29, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Mar 23, 2015   Yea 14,   Nay 5,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 22, 2015   Yea 25,   Nay 17,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 136   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 854   

Bill History

Feb 18, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 19, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 18, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Mar 19, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 136.) To printer.

Mar 20, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 23, 2015

Mar 24, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 20, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 21, 2015

  • Read second time.

May 22, 2015

May 25, 2015

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 29, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 328.
  • Effective June 2, 2015.