SB240 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 10, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Roberson, Hardy, Brower, Lipparelli, Farley, Gustavson, Hammond, Harris, Kieckhefer, Settelmeyer, Wheeler, Dickman, Paul Anderson

Makes certain changes relating to public safety. (BDR 14-955)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 329.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 23, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 27, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 30, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 14, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 29, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 02, 2015   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 21, 2015   Yea 23,   Nay 18,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 790   

Bill History

Mar 10, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 11, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Mar 30, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 31, 2015

  • Read second time.

Apr 01, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 02, 2015

Apr 03, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 19, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 20, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 790.) To printer.

May 21, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 23, Nays: 18, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 22, 2015

  • In Senate.

May 26, 2015

  • Assembly Amendment No. 790 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 329.
  • Sections 16.3, 16.5, 16.7, 20, 21 and 22 effective June 2, 2015. Sections 1 to 16, inclusive, 17, 18 and 19 effective October 1, 2015.