SB409 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 17, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Lipparelli

Revises provisions related to gaming. (BDR 41-1041)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 469.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 27, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 03, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 27, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 14, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 14, 2015   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 22, 2015   Yea 39,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 285   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 20, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 14, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 285.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 15, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 20, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 21, 2015

  • Read second time.

May 22, 2015

May 25, 2015

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 28, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 469.
  • Effective June 9, 2015.