Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

79th (2017) Session
Bill Information



History of Specific Legislation  (Bill Information)
Bill Type Number

Bill Lists

Tables and Index

 

 Legislative History


  • Specific Action Reports
  • Effective Dates
  • Effective July 1, 2017
  • Effective October 1, 2017
  • Effective January 1, 2018
  • Effective July 1, 2018
  • Effective January 1, 2019



  • All Bills are available in PDF format. Download the free Adobe Acrobat PDF Reader from the link below if you do not already have it available on your computer.



    Horizontal Rule Bar
    Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
    View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


    © 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
    Nevada LCB Logo