SB10 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 15, 2016.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions governing the publication of information concerning unclaimed and abandoned property. (BDR 10-407)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
In Senate.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 13, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 20, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 06, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Reschedule
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 07, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Reschedule   Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 10, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 28, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 17, 2017     10:00 AM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 20, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 209     Amend. No. 774   

Bill History

Nov 15, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 209.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2017

Apr 21, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.

May 24, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 774.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

May 26, 2017

  • In Senate.