SB39 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Government Affairs

Revises provisions relating to state purchasing. (BDR 27-122)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 08, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 24, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 26, 2017     10:00 AM      Agenda            Heard

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 17, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 07, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Read second time.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 19, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)