SB170 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom

Revises provisions governing public records. (BDR 19-560)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 15, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)