AJR8 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 07, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Watkins, Fumo, Yeager, Jauregui, Brooks, Joiner, McCurdy II, Miller

Urges the United States Senate to protect a woman's reproductive rights as it undergoes the process of vetting a nominee for the United States Supreme Court. (BDR R-880)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 16, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 21, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 07, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 08, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 23, 2017

  • Read second time.

Mar 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.