Statutes of the State of Nevada - Twenty-Sixth Special Session, 2010

CONTENTS

________

 

 

No.

Title

Page

1

AN ACT making an appropriation to the Legislative Fund for the costs of the 26th Special Session; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.  Senate Bill No. 1—Senators Horsford and Raggio.  Approved February 25, 2010

1

 

 

 

2

AN ACT relating to support orders; requiring certain employers to electronically transfer to the State the income withheld from employees pursuant to support orders; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.  Assembly Bill No. 1—Committee of the Whole.  Approved February 28, 2010

1

 

 

 

3

AN ACT relating to state financial administration; revising provisions relating to the transfer of certain money from the Abandoned Property Trust Account; providing for the temporary reduction by the Legislature of the assessment on state agencies for a portion of the costs of premiums or contributions for retirees with state service participating in the Public Employees’ Benefits Program; authorizing certain sums appropriated to the Department of Health and Human Services to be transferred among the various budget accounts of the Department under certain circumstances; reducing certain amounts of money budgeted for the 2009-2010 and 2010-2011 Fiscal Years; providing for revisions of certain work programs necessary to carry out and process those reductions; requiring the transfer of certain money to the State General Fund; making corresponding changes relating to such transfers; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.  Assembly Bill No. 3—Committee of the Whole.  Approved February 28, 2010

3

 

 

 

4

AN ACT relating to health care; revising provisions governing the list of preferred prescription drugs to be used for the Medicaid program; providing exceptions for medications not included in the list of preferred prescription drugs; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.  Senate Bill No. 4—Committee of the Whole.  Approved March 4, 2010

35

 

 

 

5

AN ACT relating to education; eliminating the prohibition on the use of certain accountability information concerning pupils for the evaluation of teachers and paraprofessionals; revising provisions governing the use of such information for the evaluation and discipline of teachers, paraprofessionals and other employees; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.  Senate Bill No. 2—Committee of the Whole.  Approved March 10, 2010

38

 

 

 

6

AN ACT relating to education; providing a temporary waiver from certain requirements governing expenditures of money for textbooks, instructional supplies, instructional software and instructional hardware by school districts, charter schools and university schools for profoundly gifted pupils; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.  Assembly Bill No. 5—Committee of the Whole.  Approved March 10, 2010

41

 

 

 

7

AN ACT relating to education; temporarily providing flexibility for school districts from the requirements of pupil-teacher ratios; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.  Assembly Bill No. 4—Committee of the Whole.  Approved March 10, 2010

42

 

 

 

8

AN ACT relating to governmental financial administration; revising provisions governing the Fund for Cleaning Up Discharges of Petroleum; authorizing the Department of Motor Vehicles to set the amount of certain fees by regulation; removing the prospective expiration on the collection of certain gross receipts taxes in Clark County; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.  Senate Bill No. 5—Committee of the Whole.  Approved March 11, 2010

45

 

 

 

9

AN ACT relating to counties; authorizing deviation from the required hours of operation for county offices under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.  Assembly Bill No. 2—Committee of the Whole.  Approved March 11, 2010

50

 

 

 

10

AN ACT relating to governmental financial administration; revising certain appropriations from the State General Fund for the support of the civil government of the State of Nevada; authorizing expenditures by certain agencies and entities of the State Government; providing for the transfer of certain appropriated money to the next fiscal year; requiring the Clean Water Coalition to transfer certain money to the State Controller for deposit in the State General Fund; increasing fees imposed for certain filings or registrations made with the Office of the Secretary of State; revising provisions relating to foreclosure of real property; revising provisions relating to the use of money in the Account for Common-Interest Communities and Condominium Hotels; increasing certain administrative assessments imposed against persons who commit certain crimes; authorizing the Department of Corrections to adopt regulations to allow the Department to deduct money credited to the Offenders’ Store Fund for certain purposes and to impose a charge on purchases of electronic devices; providing for the temporary transfer of certain lobbyist registration fees; increasing certain fees charged by the State Registrar; authorizing the Department of Wildlife to use fees collected for processing applications for tags for certain additional purposes; imposing an additional fee for filing certain affidavits relating to mining claims; reducing the basic support guarantees of school districts for purposes of apportionments from the State Distributive School Account; requiring the Department of Taxation to allow for the payment of delinquent taxes, fees or assessments without a penalty for a limited period in certain circumstances; requiring the Division of Insurance of the Department of Business and Industry to carry out a desk audit program to audit insurance premium tax returns; providing for the use of money from an award from the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Emergency Contingency funds; making appropriations; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.  Assembly Bill No. 6—Committee of the Whole.  Approved March 12, 2010

53