Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB450
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Judiciary
Makes various changes to provisions governing temporary and extended orders for protection against stalking, aggravated stalking, harassment and domestic violence and for protection of children. (BDR 15-1407)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 269.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr-13-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Judiciary     May-11-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Judiciary     May-17-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Judiciary     May-18-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-21   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-26   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.318 Amend. No.814

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 318.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 22, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 23, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 24, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 814.) To printer.

May 25, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 27, 2005

  • In Senate.

May 31, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment No. 814 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 06, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 269.
  • Effective July 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo