Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB380
Introduced on: Mar 16, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kirkpatrick
Revises certain requirements relating to radar guns. (BDR 40-1188)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 44.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 30, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 05, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Apr. 26, 2007     02:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 16   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 03   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                             As Enrolled        

Bill History

Mar 16, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 19, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 12, 2007

  • Read second time.

Apr 13, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 17, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To committee.

Apr 30, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 01, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 02, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 03, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 07, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 08, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 14, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

May 15, 2007

  • Chapter 44.
  • Effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us |   


© Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo