Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB526
Introduced on: Mar 23, 2007
By: Commerce and Labor
Revises provisions relating to community antenna television, cable television, video service, Internet service and other information technology. (BDR 58-1129)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 326.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 02, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      To Subcommittee .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 05, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes       .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 13, 2007     12:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 26, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 03, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass, as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 08, 2007     07:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 11, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 18, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Rescind previous action on: 5-11-07 .   Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 08   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 470
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 702
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 991

Bill History

Mar 23, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 26, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 470.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 24, 2007

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 07, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 08, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 09, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 22, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 23, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 702.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 991.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 28, 2007

  • Senate Amendment Nos. 702 and 991 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 326.
  • Effective June 4, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo