Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB530
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Commerce and Labor
Creates the Office of Ombudsman of Consumer Affairs for Minorities. (BDR 18-1375)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 30, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 05, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass, and rerefer .
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 16, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 27, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 02, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 09, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo