Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB101
Introduced on: Feb 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Mathews , Washington
Amends the Charter of the City of Sparks. (BDR S-335)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 321.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar. 05, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar. 07, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar. 21, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 17, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 15, 2007     08:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 28, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Concur .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Mar. 28   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 746

Bill History

Feb 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 22, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read second time.

Mar 27, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 28, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Mar 29, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 24, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 746.) To printer.

May 25, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 26, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 29, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment No. 746 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 30, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 321.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo