AB45
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 06, 2008.
By: Government Affairs

Makes various changes to provisions governing public defenders. (BDR 20-457)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 11, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 18, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 20, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, without recommendation, and rerefer
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 27, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.395   

Bill History

Dec 06, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 07, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time.
  • Action of referral rescinded.
  • Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 395.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)