AB59
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 09, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Creates a rebuttable presumption against an award of custody or unsupervised visitation for any person who has abducted a child in the past. (BDR 11-265)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 67.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 06, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 12, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Not Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 27, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 29, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 15   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 01   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.59   

Bill History

Dec 09, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 11, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 59.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

Apr 16, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 29, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 30, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 01, 2009

May 02, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 05, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 11, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 67.
  • Effective May 11, 2009.