AB61
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 09, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Requires notification of certain victims of crime of the discharge, conditional release or escape of certain persons from the custody of the Administrator of the Division of Mental Health and Developmental Services of the Department of Health and Human Services. (BDR 14-339)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 36.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 20, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 12, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Not Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 28, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 14   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 30   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.58   

Bill History

Dec 09, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 11, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 58.) To printer.

Apr 14, 2009

Apr 15, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 28, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 29, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 30, 2009

May 01, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 06, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 36.
  • Effective May 6, 2009.