AB64
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 11, 2008.
By: Ways and Means

Increases the number of judges in the Second and Eighth Judicial Districts. (BDR 1-371)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 442.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 04, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 09, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Without recommendation, and rerefer
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 06, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 12, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 21, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Judiciary     May. 28, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 36,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 2,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 28   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.672   

Bill History

Dec 11, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time.
  • Action of referral rescinded.
  • Referred to Concurrent Committees on Judiciary and Ways and Means. To committees.

Mar 02, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 10, 2009

  • From Concurrent Committee on Judiciary: Without recommendation.
  • To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Exemption effective.

May 18, 2009

  • From Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 672.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 4, Not voting: 2.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 28, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 29, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 442.
  • Section 10 effective June 3, 2009. If, and only if, Assembly Bill 65 of this session is enacted by the Legislature and becomes effective: Sections 1, 3, 6, 7 and 9 of this act effective October 1, 2009. Section 8 of this act effective July 1, 2010. Sections 1 and 3 of this act expire by limitation January 2, 2011. Sections 2, 4 and 5 of this act effective January 3, 2011.