AB65
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 11, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Provides for the collection and disposition of additional court fees. (BDR 2-372)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 443.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 04, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 11, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 09, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, without recommendation, and rerefer
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 06, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 12, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 21, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May. 23, 2009     12:55 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Judiciary     May. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 33,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 2,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 28   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.345     Amend. No.673     Amend. No.961   

Bill History

Dec 11, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 12, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 345.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 673.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 7, Not voting: 2.)
  • To printer.

May 19, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 26, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2009

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 961.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

May 30, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 961 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 443.
  • Sections 1 to 5 and 8, inclusive, of this act effective July 1, 2009. Sections 6 and 7 of this act effective July 1, 2009, if, and only if, Assembly Bill No. 64 of this session is enacted by the Legislature and becomes effective.