SB83
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Makes various changes relating to the regulation of gaming. (BDR 41-311)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 79.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 10, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 23, 2009     10:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 06, 2009     08:15 AM    Minutes          Concur   Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Judiciary     May. 06, 2009     08:29 AM    Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 08   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 02   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.17     Amend. No.572   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 02, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 17.) To printer.

Apr 07, 2009

Apr 08, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 29, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 01, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 572.) To printer.

May 02, 2009

May 04, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 08, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 572 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 13, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 18, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 79.
  • Sections 4, 6 to 12, inclusive, 14 to 20, inclusive and section 21 effective July 1, 2009. Sections 3 and 13 effective May 18, 2009 for the purpose of adopting regulations; and on October 1, 2009, for all other purposes. Sections 1, 2 and 5 effective October 1, 2009.