SB84
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Authorizes cities to create departments of alternative sentencing. (BDR 16-257)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 412.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 18, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Apr. 28, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     May. 14, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do not concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 06   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.7     Amend. No.723   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 01, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 7.) To printer.

Apr 02, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 06, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 723.) To printer.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 28, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 723 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

May 29, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 723 receded from. To Senate.

May 30, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 412.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.