AB78
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Corrections, Parole, and Probation

Requires the State Forester Firewarden to establish and carry out a program for operating conservation camps. (BDR 16-358)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 3.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Feb. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Feb. 19, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 03, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Feb. 23   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar. 09   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 19, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 20, 2009

  • Read second time.

Feb 23, 2009

Feb 24, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Mar 04, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 05, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 09, 2009

Mar 10, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Mar 11, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Mar 12, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 3.
  • Effective March 12, 2009.