AB81
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Corrections, Parole, and Probation

Makes various changes relating to the Central Repository for Nevada Records of Criminal History. (BDR 14-314)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 367.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Feb. 24, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Mar. 12, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 27, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 04, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 05   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 26   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.49   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 49.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Exemption effective.
  • To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.

May 05, 2009

May 06, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 26, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 367.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.