AB88
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Makes various changes relating to child pornography. (BDR 15-267)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 471.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 04, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 09, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 26, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 12, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Not Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 16, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 01, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May. 08, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May. 13, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 21, 2009     10:39 AM    Minutes          Do not concur

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 38,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    4th Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.64     Amend. No.469     Amend. No.690     Amend. No.CA37   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 64.) To printer.

Apr 03, 2009

Apr 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 09, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 10, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 16, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 469.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 690.) To printer.

May 20, 2009

May 21, 2009

  • In Assembly.

May 29, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 690 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 30, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Senate Amendment No. 690 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 01, 2009

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 690 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.

Jun 02, 2009

  • To printer.

Jun 03, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 08, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 471.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.