SB99
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Limits the peace officer powers of taxicab field investigators. (BDR 23-432)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 20, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Indefinitely Postponed

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)