SB100
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Revises the provisions governing the period of revocation of a driver's license upon conviction of certain offenses involving driving under the influence. (BDR 43-342)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 255.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 17, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 28, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Transportation     May. 07, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 20, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Feb. 20   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 13   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.633   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 17, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 18, 2009

  • Read second time.

Feb 19, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Feb 20, 2009

Feb 23, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 12, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 633.) To printer.

May 13, 2009

May 15, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 20, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 633 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 255.
  • Effective May 28, 2009.